U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Bretas v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on 2255 Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 05, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.