U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00181
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gilbane Federal et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • November 05, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.