U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20863
  • Case Name: Rebecca R. Jimenez and Gerardo Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modified Plan]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modify Plan]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Limit Notice ]
  • December 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Limit Notice]
  • December 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • December 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modify Plan]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modified Plan]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modify Plan]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacating Order]
October, 2021
  • October 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Reinstate Case]
  • October 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modified Plan]
  • October 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Exhibit]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modify Plan]
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Generic Motion]
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacating Order]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • October 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim(s)]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
March, 2019
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.