U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20868
  • Case Name: Douglas M Vahai and Aubri Monique Vahai
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Response]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Dismiss Debtor]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
November, 2018
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.