U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00186
  • Case Name: Sletten Construction of Wyoming Inc v. Capitol Indemnity Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Removal]
  • November 09, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • November 09, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.