U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Flowers v. Terracon Consultants Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 11, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [In Limine]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Strike]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 02, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • August 09, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Vacating Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 01, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Response]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Supplement]
  • July 16, 2019: [Response]
  • July 12, 2019: [Brief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 02, 2019: [Reply]
  • January 02, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 26, 2018: [Opposition]
  • December 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • November 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.