U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02036
  • Case Name: Michigan Unemployment Insurance Agency v. Novel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • November 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • September 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Status Report]
  • August 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [To Amend Order]
  • August 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Order]
  • August 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • May 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2019
  • January 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • January 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • December 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • December 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.