U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Mortensen v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 03, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 14, 2019: [Supplement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 24, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 02, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • May 01, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 13, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • January 23, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 13, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 13, 2018: [Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.