U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Woodie et al v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 06, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 22, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • June 04, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • June 03, 2019: [Opposition]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 15, 2019: [Brief]
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 05, 2019: [Reply Brief]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 12, 2019: [Brief]
  • February 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 11, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 01, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 01, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 07, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2018: [Reply Brief]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 27, 2018: [Removal]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 26, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • November 15, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 13, 2018: [Brief]
  • November 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2018: [Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.