U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00189
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 17 Bank Accounts Containing Various Amounts of United States Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 01, 2020: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 21, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 17, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 17, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • July 08, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Exhibits for Trial]
  • February 25, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • October 28, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2019: [Stay Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 26, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 24, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response]
  • April 12, 2019: [- Ex-Parte Document]
  • April 12, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • April 12, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Dispositive]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Dispositive]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 21, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Dispositive]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2019: [Entry of Default]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 26, 2019: [Reply]
  • February 26, 2019: [Service by Publication]
  • February 25, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 23, 2019: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Reply]
  • February 22, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 22, 2019: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • February 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Return of Warrant of Arrest In Rem - Executed]
  • February 13, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 13, 2019: [Joinder - Dispositive]
  • February 13, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • February 13, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 11, 2019: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 11, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 26, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 04, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.