U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02038
  • Case Name: Royal v. Reilly
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • January 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Payment]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.