U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02037
  • Case Name: Royal v. Miskimins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • January 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Entry of Default]
November, 2018
  • November 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Payment]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.