U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20878
  • Case Name: Vicki Karlita Reed Zettlemoyer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.