U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Headley v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 01, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set Aside]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Letter(s)]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Letter(s)]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • December 16, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 04, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 03, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Stay Case]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Reply]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Brief]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 16, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 15, 2019: [Statement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2019: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • January 15, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • January 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 15, 2019: [Affidavit]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • November 14, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • November 14, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.