U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Rejda v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [USCA Order (Financial)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 25, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Reply to Response]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 14, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.