U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Reisfield v. SAVIT Associates LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Minute Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Status Report Order]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2019: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 10, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • March 04, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 01, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • March 01, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 19, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 13, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 07, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 14, 2019: [Recusal]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Jury Demand]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.