U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Weed v. Western World Insurance Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 06, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Report Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2019: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 02, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • July 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • July 26, 2019: [Stay Discovery]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 26, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 08, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 07, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • January 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 19, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • November 16, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.