U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20897
  • Case Name: Steven Lynn Kukes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.