U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20895
  • Case Name: Rooney Richard Ryan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Social Security Number]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule J]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule I]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule H]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule G]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule C]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule A/B]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.