U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00197
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $3,451.13 in US Currency Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Accocunt, Number XXXXXX9970 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 06, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • March 06, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 06, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Service by Publication]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.