U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02039
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Royal
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stay]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • January 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection]
  • January 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • November 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.