U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20907
  • Case Name: David Anthony Gregorio and Amber Layne Miller-Gregorio
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Transmittal of Small Dividends]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.