U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Ellis et al v. Wyoming Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Martinez Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 22, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • November 04, 2019: [Reply]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • September 04, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 17, 2019: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 13, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Entry]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Exhibit]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Letter(s)]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Service of Process]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 27, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 27, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.