U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20915
  • Case Name: Carina Lynne White
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.