U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00202
  • Case Name: Holmgren v. D&M Carriers LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 06, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 12, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • February 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.