U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20924
  • Case Name: Jacob Michael Smith and Tera Renae Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compel]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compel]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.