U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00204
  • Case Name: McFadden v. NFSM Pizza Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 16, 2020: [In Court Hearing]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Letter(s)]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 11, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • February 11, 2020: [Stay Case]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • June 06, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 05, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 13, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Praecipe]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.