U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Dearing et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • August 26, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • May 10, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • May 02, 2019: [Response]
  • May 01, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Consolidate Cases for Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 30, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • January 22, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • December 10, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • December 10, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 10, 2018: [Answer to Notice of Removal]
  • December 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 05, 2018: [Removal]
  • December 05, 2018: [Complaint]
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.