U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company v. Horizons Business Solutions Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 03, 2019: [Show Cause]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Status Report]
  • June 06, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 06, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • June 06, 2019: [Status Report Order]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • March 05, 2019: [Affidavit]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.