U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Raine v. A Big Storage LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 14, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 15, 2020: [Response]
  • January 15, 2020: [Errata]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 09, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 08, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 07, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 02, 2020: [In Limine]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 24, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 23, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [In Limine]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 15, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 11, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2019: [Add Party]
  • March 01, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.