U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20939
  • Case Name: Cody M Luegering
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
August, 2019
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2019
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.