U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20942
  • Case Name: Amber Wood and Tyrrell W Wood
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Withdrawal]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2020
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Objection to]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Proposed Order]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Affidavit]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Vacate]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Exhibit]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Trustees Motion to Dismiss Case]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order (Generic)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case - Trustee]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Affidavit]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.