U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20940
  • Case Name: Crystal Ann Chacon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - Ad Hoc Minimal Funds]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.