U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Lemmings v. Killpack Trucking Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • October 16, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • September 17, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 04, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 04, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • August 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 19, 2020: [Response]
  • August 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 17, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 20, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 17, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 15, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 19, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2020: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 02, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [In Limine]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Supplement]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 29, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 17, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • October 09, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 01, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 17, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 28, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.