U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20944
  • Case Name: Debra Kay Lippard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Transmittal of Small Dividends]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Redact]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.