U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02043
  • Case Name: Brinton v. Brinton et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stay]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.