U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Hancook v. SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 17, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Status Report]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Witness List]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 28, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 24, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.