U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Allen v. Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik LLP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 10, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 17, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.