U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Stumpf v. Laramie County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Letter(s)]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 15, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.