U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20962
  • Case Name: Jean Elizabeth Lake
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.