U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Societe Generale v. Escalera Resources Co et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Mail Returned]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • December 09, 2019: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • December 09, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Mail Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Mail Returned]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 27, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • June 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 09, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Response]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • March 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 01, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Letter(s)]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 04, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Deposit Funds]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.