U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Petzold et al v. NCC Business Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 03, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • January 14, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 26, 2018: [Complaint]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.