U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Ketchum v. Killpack Trucking Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 17, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 28, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.