U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Merkt v. Bautista-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 23, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • January 03, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • January 03, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Removal]
  • December 28, 2018: [Complaint]
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.