U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Mathisen v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate Recalled]
  • September 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • June 21, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 21, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 21, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 21, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 15, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 02, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.