U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Demos v. United States Attorney General et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Mail Returned]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 07, 2019: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.