U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Mountain v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 24, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 14, 2020: [Designation]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 03, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 03, 2020: [Strike]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 31, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 22, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 17, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • July 15, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 02, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • April 20, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 17, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • April 07, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 24, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 22, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.