U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Phillips & Jordan v. Erosion Control Applications Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Brief]
  • April 24, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 13, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 08, 2019: [Entry of Default]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • January 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.