U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Worley et al v. Patterson-UTI Drilling Company LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 24, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • June 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 10, 2020: [Vacate]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 09, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 30, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 29, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 17, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 10, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 09, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 01, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Objection]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Objection]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 20, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 29, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • December 27, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • December 07, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • November 03, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 02, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Payment Entry]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 14, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 29, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 12, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 11, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 11, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • February 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.