U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20019
  • Case Name: Melissa Ann Martinez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2019
  • September 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
May, 2019
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Addendum]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.